WA SB5292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning prescription drug cost transparency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning prescription drug cost transparency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-27HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM.
2019-03-01HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-28Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-08SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-08SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-08SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback