WA SB5291 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating alternatives to total confinement for certain qualifying persons with minor children.
Title
Creating alternatives to total confinement for certain qualifying persons with minor children.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 137, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-17 | House | 3rd substitute bill not substituted. |
2020-02-11 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-03 | House | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2020-01-30 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | House | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | House | HSRR - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |