WA SB5288 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing access to the Washington opportunity scholarship program.
Title
Increasing access to the Washington opportunity scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28b | 145 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 145 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 145 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 145 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |