WA SB5279 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Housing & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Housing & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an additional revenue source for eviction prevention and housing stability services.
Title
Providing for an additional revenue source for eviction prevention and housing stability services.
Sponsors
Sen. June Robinson [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1277 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 185c | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 185c | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185c | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 185c | 190 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5279&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5279.pdf |