WA SB5279 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating outdoor burning for the protection of life or property and for public health, safety, and welfare.
Title
Regulating outdoor burning for the protection of life or property and for public health, safety, and welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-02 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |