WA SB5278 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical changes to boiler and unfired pressure vessel statutes.
Title
Making technical changes to boiler and unfired pressure vessel statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-02 | LCCP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 9:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1366 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-15 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5278&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5278.pdf |