WA SB5276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing hemp production in conformance with the agriculture improvement act of 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing hemp production in conformance with the agriculture improvement act of 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateEffective date 4/26/2019.
2019-04-26SenateChapter 158, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-26SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-24SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-24SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-23HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-23HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseCOG - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-12Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-25SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-07SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5276&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5276.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5276-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5276-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5276-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5276-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5276-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117732&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5276&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117732&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5276&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117732&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5276&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback