WA SB5271 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 5/10/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the necessary elements of proof of injury during the state of emergency declared due to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the necessary elements of proof of injury during the state of emergency declared due to the COVID-19 pandemic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10SenateEffective date 5/10/2021.
2021-05-10SenateChapter 241, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-10SenateGovernor signed.
2021-04-20SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-19HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-16HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2021-02-23SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-23SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-23Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-02-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-11SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
770040Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5271&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5271.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5271-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Passed%20Legislature/5271-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/Senate/5271-S.SL.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5271%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5271%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5271%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5271-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5271-S%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5271-S%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5271-S%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5271-S%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123596&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28542&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123596&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5271&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123596&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28868&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123596&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-09-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5271&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback