WA SB5270 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving access to department of licensing issued documents by extending the issuance period of driver licenses and identicards to eight years, allowing online issuance and renewal of instruction permits, and expanding online renewal of driver licenses and identicards.
Title
Improving access to department of licensing issued documents by extending the issuance period of driver licenses and identicards to eight years, allowing online issuance and renewal of instruction permits, and expanding online renewal of driver licenses and identicards.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] |
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Jeff Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1207 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 20 | 049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 20 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |