WA SB5269 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Including the value of increased residential building capacity in the property tax levy limit calculation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including the value of increased residential building capacity in the property tax levy limit calculation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-10SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-10SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-10SenateHLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-10SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing & Local Government.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3670aNew CodeSee Bill Text
8455010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5269&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5269.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5269-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5269%20SBA%20HLG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5269%20SBR%20HLG%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5269%20SBR%20HLG%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123585&actionText=HLG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28589&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback