WA SB5264 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Declaring January as Chinese American history month and encouraging public schools to commemorate the month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declaring January as Chinese American history month and encouraging public schools to commemorate the month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-05SenateSGE - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government & Elections.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43117New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback