WA SB5263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the procurement of seeds by state agencies.
Title
Concerning the procurement of seeds by state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-21 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |