WA SB5262 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Releasing juvenile case records to the Washington state office of civil legal aid.
Title
Releasing juvenile case records to the Washington state office of civil legal aid.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Bruce Dammeier [R] |
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Chapter 262, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-01 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing . |