WA SB5261 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning irrigation district authority.
Title
Concerning irrigation district authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 63, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2017-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-22 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 6:40 PM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1578 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-16 - Governor vetoed.