WA SB5255 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning language understanding of documents used in dissolution proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning language understanding of documents used in dissolution proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2609New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback