WA SB5251 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying tax and revenue laws in a manner that is not estimated to affect state or local tax collections, by easing compliance burdens for taxpayers, clarifying ambiguities, making technical corrections, and providing administrative efficiencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying tax and revenue laws in a manner that is not estimated to affect state or local tax collections, by easing compliance burdens for taxpayers, clarifying ambiguities, making technical corrections, and providing administrative efficiencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-26SenateChapter 145, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-26SenateGovernor signed.
2021-04-20SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-12HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-25HouseFIN - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Finance.
2021-02-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-25SenateFloor amendment
2021-02-25Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-18SenatePlaced on second reading.
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-02-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-11SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5428040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5428055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7964110Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
8204051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8204220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82042404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8204260Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8204261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82042907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82080531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8208956Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82089651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82089999Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8212010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8212956Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82129651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8214532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8225045Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
8229a090Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8232New CodeSee Bill Text
8232330Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8232534Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8232805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8436385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8440130Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84520531Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8452080Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5251&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5251.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5251-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5251-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5251-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5251-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5251-S%20AMS%20SCHO%20S1233.1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5251-S%20AMS%20LOVE%20S1449.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5251%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5251%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5251%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5251-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5251-S.E%20HBA%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5251-S.E%20HBR%20FIN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5251-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5251-S.E%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123530&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28562&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123530&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-25-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5251&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123530&actionText=FIN%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28907&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123530&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5251&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback