WA SB5242 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-25 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting media literacy and digital citizenship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting media literacy and digital citizenship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-25HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2021-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-03-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2021-03-25HouseED - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM.
2021-03-05HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2021-03-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-01SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-22SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM.
2021-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-03SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-03SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-03SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a300New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5242&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5242.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5242%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5242%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5242%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5242%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5242%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5242%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5242%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5242%20HBA%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5242%20HBR%20ED%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123496&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28438&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123496&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28693&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123496&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5242&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123496&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28930&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback