WA SB5239 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring that water is available to support development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring that water is available to support development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20HouseReturned to Senate Rules 3.
2017-06-29HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-06-29HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-06-29HouseFloor amendment
2017-06-29HouseHeld on second reading.
2017-06-29HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2017-06-29HouseRules suspended.
2017-06-27HousePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-06-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2017-06-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-06-13HousePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-05-05HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2017-05-02SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-23SenatePlaced on Rules White Sheet.
2017-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2017-03-29HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2017-03-02HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2017-02-28SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-02-28SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-28SenateFloor amendment
2017-02-28Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-23SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-23SenateMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-23SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-10SenateOn motion, referred to Ways & Means.
2017-02-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-09SenateMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-09SenateAWTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5239&year=2017
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5239.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5239-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5239-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5239-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5239-S2.E2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=5239&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-28-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=5239&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=05-02-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=5239&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=06-13-2017
Roll Callhttp://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?billNumber=5239&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=06-29-2017

Bill Comments

feedback