WA SB5230 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning licensing and regulatory requirements of small business owners.
Title
Concerning licensing and regulatory requirements of small business owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-22 | House | SEIT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government, Elections & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2017-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | CLS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1352 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.