WA SB5229 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning health equity continuing education for health care professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning health equity continuing education for health care professionals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-05-12SenateChapter 276, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-12SenateGovernor signed.
2021-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-15SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2021-04-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2021-03-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-24HouseCommittee amendment
2021-03-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-19HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-17HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2021-03-17HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-03-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-24HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2021-02-17SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-17SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-17SenateFloor amendment
2021-02-17Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-02-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-05SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-02-05SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4370New CodeSee Bill Text
4370615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5229&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5229.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5229-S.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5229-S.E.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Passed%20Legislature/5229-S.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/Senate/5229-S.SL.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5229-S%20AMS%20HOLY%20S1200.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5229-S%20AMS%20RAND%20S1148.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5229-S%20AMS%20RIVE%20S1199.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5229-S%20AMS%20ERIC%20S1197.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5229-S%20AMS%20WILJ%20S1194.1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/5229-S.E%20AMH%20HCW%20H1297.1.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5229%20SBA%20HLTC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5229%20SBR%20HLTC%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5229%20SBR%20HLTC%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5229-S.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5229-S.E%20HBA%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5229-S.E%20HBR%20HCW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5229-S.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5229-S.E%20SBR%20HA0%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5229-S.E%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123461&actionText=HLTC%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28488&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123461&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-17-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5229&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123461&actionText=HCW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28820&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123461&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-24-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5229&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123461&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5229&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback