WA SB5225 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directing the completion of a study of certain environmental impacts, including ultrafine particulate emissions, associated with aircraft traffic in areas impacted by airport operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the completion of a study of certain environmental impacts, including ultrafine particulate emissions, associated with aircraft traffic in areas impacted by airport operations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2017-02-08SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2017-02-08SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2017-02-08SenateEET - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 9:00 AM.
2017-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.

Same As/Similar To

HB1171 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback