WA SB5225 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning sexual assault examination kits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning sexual assault examination kits.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-01-11SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1068 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-14 - Effective date 7/24/2015.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback