WA SB5225 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating soil science and wetland science professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating soil science and wetland science professions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-02-22 Senate Rules "X" file.
2012-02-07 Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
2012-01-25 Moved to Rules White Sheet.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-03-16 Senate Rules "X" file.
2011-03-07 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-03-02 Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
2011-02-18 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-02-18 Minority; without recommendation.
2011-02-18 Minority; do not pass.
2011-02-18 WM - Majority; without recommendation.
2011-02-17 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2011-02-07 Referred to Ways & Means.
2011-02-04 Minority; do not pass.
2011-02-04 And refer to Ways & Means.
2011-02-04 LCCP - Majority; do pass.
2011-02-03 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 10:00 AM.
2011-02-01 Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM.
2011-01-25 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor and Commerce & Consumer Protection at 1:30 PM.
2011-01-18 First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Consumer Protection.

Same As/Similar To

HB1313 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback