WA SB5225 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning crimes against property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning crimes against property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-01-26 Senate Rules "X" file.
2010-01-11 Made eligible to be placed on third reading.
2010-01-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2009-04-26 By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2009-03-17 Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM.
2009-03-09 First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness.
2009-03-05 Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2009-03-05 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2009-03-05 Floor amendment
2009-03-05 1st substitute bill substituted
2009-03-03 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2009-02-24 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2009-02-24 Minority; without recommendation.
2009-02-24 JUD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2009-02-20 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2009-02-03 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2009-01-16 First reading, referred to Judiciary.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback