WA SB5225 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 6/13/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning direct appeals to the court of appeals of cases brought under the administrative procedure act and the land use petition act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning direct appeals to the court of appeals of cases brought under the administrative procedure act and the land use petition act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateEffective date 6/13/2021*.
2021-05-13SenateChapter 305, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2021-04-23SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-15HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-12HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-12HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-25HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2021-02-23SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-23SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-02-12SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-11SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-02-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3405518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3405522Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3618018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3670cNew CodeSee Bill Text
3670c090New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5225&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5225.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5225.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5225.SL.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5225%20HBA%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5225%20HBR%20CRJ%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5225%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5225%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123457&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28542&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123457&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-23-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5225&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123457&actionText=CRJ%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28734&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123457&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5225&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback