WA SB5220 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the taxation of salmon recovery grants by updating the state business and occupation tax deduction for these grants, creating a sales and use tax exemption for grant proceeds received by recipients of these grants, and clarifying the sales and use tax obligations for goods and services purchased by recipients of these grants.
Title
Concerning the taxation of salmon recovery grants by updating the state business and occupation tax deduction for these grants, creating a sales and use tax exemption for grant proceeds received by recipients of these grants, and clarifying the sales and use tax obligations for goods and services purchased by recipients of these grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Effective date 4/26/2021*. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Chapter 143, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-25 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:30 AM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 04 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 4339 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |