WA SB5216 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning additional transparency and accountability for tax preferences.
Title
Concerning additional transparency and accountability for tax preferences.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Subjects
LEGISLATIVE AUDIT AND REVIEW COMMITTEE, JOINT (JLARC)
REVENUE, DEPARTMENT
SENIOR CITIZENS
TAX PREFERENCES - EXEMPTIONS, CREDITS, DEDUCTIONS, DEFERRALS, ETC.
REVENUE, DEPARTMENT
SENIOR CITIZENS
TAX PREFERENCES - EXEMPTIONS, CREDITS, DEDUCTIONS, DEFERRALS, ETC.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 06 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 136 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 88a | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 32 | 330 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 32 | 808 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |