WA SB5211 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing tax increment financing for local governments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing tax increment financing for local governments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-02-17SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-17SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-17SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-11SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-01-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28SenateBFST - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-14SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.

Same As/Similar To

HB1189 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-11 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39New CodeSee Bill Text
8455010Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5211&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5211.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5211-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5211-S2.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5211%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5211%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5211%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5211%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5211%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5211%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123432&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28327&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123432&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28635&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback