WA SB5210 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning updates to competency restoration order requirements.
Title
Concerning updates to competency restoration order requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-26 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 77 | 086 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 77 | 088 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |