WA SB5206 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Early Learning & K-12 Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for career and technical education opportunities for elementary school students.
Title
Providing for career and technical education opportunities for elementary school students.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5206&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5206.pdf |