WA SB5205 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding one judge to division two of the court of appeals.
Title
Adding one judge to division two of the court of appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-04 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1205 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-13 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5205&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5205.pdf |