WA SB5205 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - On motion, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - On motion, referred to Law & Justice.
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning limitations in parenting plans related to parental conduct.
Title
Concerning limitations in parenting plans related to parental conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | On motion, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
26 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 09 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |