WA SB5202 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing school district depreciation subfunds for the purposes of preventative maintenance.
Title
Establishing school district depreciation subfunds for the purposes of preventative maintenance.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Perry Dozier [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-23 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |