WA SB5202 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the financial education public-private partnership.
Title
Regarding the financial education public-private partnership.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] |
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Cyrus Habib [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 211, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2015-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-26 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |