WA SB5201 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning department of natural resources' timber and land sales.
Title
Concerning department of natural resources' timber and land sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-02 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-04-25 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-19 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
79 | 11 | 130 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 15 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 15 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
79 | 15 | 150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |