WA SB5201 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning individuals receiving both employment and community access services.
Title
Concerning individuals receiving both employment and community access services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate insists on its position and asks House to recede. |
2017-04-18 | House | House insists on its position and asks Senate to recede. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2017-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | House | Vote on final passage will be reconsidered. |
2017-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2017-04-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-03-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-29 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1304 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.