WA SB5197 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Scheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM
Pending: House Housing, Community Development & Veterans Committee
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 10:00 am in House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans
Hearing: Feb 28 @ 8:00 am in House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the Washington national guard postsecondary education grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the Washington national guard postsecondary education grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM
2020-02-26HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM
2020-02-25HouseScheduled for executive session in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM
2020-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans.
2020-01-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2020-01-21HousePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseHOUS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-26SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-18SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-18SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Same As/Similar To

HB1201 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Scheduled for public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback