WA SB5195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing cities and counties authority to use real estate excise taxes to support affordable housing and homelessness projects.
Title
Providing cities and counties authority to use real estate excise taxes to support affordable housing and homelessness projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1219 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5195&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5195.pdf |