WA SB5192 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing administrative law judges to substitute for pollution control hearings board members in deciding derelict vessel appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing administrative law judges to substitute for pollution control hearings board members in deciding derelict vessel appeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-24 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - House - House Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-06SenateEffective date 7/23/2023.
2023-04-06SenateChapter 39, 2023 Laws.
2023-04-06SenateGovernor signed.
2023-03-31SenateDelivered to Governor.
2023-03-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2023-03-29SenatePresident signed.
2023-03-24HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-03-24HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-23HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-03-17HouseAGNR - Majority; do pass.
2023-03-17HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM.
2023-03-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:30 AM.
2023-02-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2023-02-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-02-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-02-08SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2023-01-30SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2023-01-26SenateAWNP - Majority; do pass.
2023-01-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2023-01-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1081 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79100120Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5192&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5192.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Passed%20Legislature/5192.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/Senate/5192.SL.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBA%20AWNP%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBR%20AWNP%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBR%20AWNP%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBR%20APS%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5192%20HBA%20AGNR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5192%20HBR%20AGNR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5192%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBR%20FBR%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65554
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127225&actionText=AWNP%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30424&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127225&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-15-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5192&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127225&actionText=AGNR%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30960&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=127225&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-24-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5192&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback