WA SB5192 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting access to electric vehicle supply equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting access to electric vehicle supply equipment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-02-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-02-11SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1994New CodeSee Bill Text
1994010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1994175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1994190Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1994517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4608185Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5192&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5192.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5192-S.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBA%20TRAN%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBR%20TRAN%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5192%20SBR%20TRAN%20OC%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123400&actionText=TRAN%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28603&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback