WA SB5190 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Effective date 5/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Effective date 5/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing health care workers with presumptive benefits during a public health emergency.
Title
Providing health care workers with presumptive benefits during a public health emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Labor & Workplace Standards (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass with amendment(s) by Labor & Workplace Standards (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Effective date 5/11/2021. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 251, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 37; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | LCTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. |
Subjects
COVID-19 AND CORONAVIRUS
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION
WORKERS' COMPENSATION
EMERGENCY, STATE OF
HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONS AND PROVIDERS
UNEMPLOYMENT COMPENSATION
WORKERS' COMPENSATION
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
50 | 20 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 20 | 050 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 29 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |