WA SB5187 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting livestock against predator attacks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting livestock against predator attacks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2014-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-05-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2013-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2013-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2013-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2013-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2013-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-02-18SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-15SenateMinority; do not pass.
2013-02-15SenateNRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2013-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB1191 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback