WA SB5185 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-19 - Referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
Pending: House Civil Rights & Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning capacity to provide informed consent for health care decisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning capacity to provide informed consent for health care decisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseReferred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2021-02-19HouseCommittee relieved of further consideration.
2021-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2021-02-16SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-02-16SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-02-16Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2021-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-01-29SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-01-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2021-01-28SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6950317Amended CodeSee Bill Text
770050Amended CodeSee Bill Text
770060Amended CodeSee Bill Text
770065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7002220Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5185&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5185.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5185-S.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/5185-S%20AMS%20PADD%20S1144.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5185%20SBA%20LAW%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5185%20SBR%20LAW%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5185%20SBR%20LAW%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5185-S%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123390&actionText=LAW%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28351&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123390&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-16-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5185&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback