WA SB5185 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing immunity from liability for professional or trade associations providing emergency response volunteers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing immunity from liability for professional or trade associations providing emergency response volunteers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-17SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-17SenateChapter 36, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-17SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-11SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-06SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-04-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-23HouseJUDI - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
2017-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2017-03-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Judiciary
2017-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-01Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-09SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-08SenateSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government.

Same As/Similar To

HB1277 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback