WA SB5185 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the powers of water-sewer districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the powers of water-sewer districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-05-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
2013-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Governmental Operations.

Same As/Similar To

HB1239 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback