WA SB5185 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Temporarily suspending certain motorcycle rules when operating in parades or public demonstrations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporarily suspending certain motorcycle rules when operating in parades or public demonstrations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-12-07 Senate Rules "X" file.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-22 By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2011-03-24 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-03-22 TR - Majority; do pass.
2011-03-22 TR - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-03-22 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2011-03-08 Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2011-02-10 First reading, referred to Transportation.
2011-02-09 Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2011-02-09 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2011-02-09 1st substitute bill substituted
2011-02-01 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-01-26 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-01-25 TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-01-24 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2011-01-20 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2011-01-17 First reading, referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback