WA SB5185 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing solar energy incentives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing solar energy incentives.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-15 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2010-01-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2009-01-23 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2009-01-15 First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback