WA SB5184 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a building point of contact in all K-12 public schools for students in foster care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a building point of contact in all K-12 public schools for students in foster care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-16SenateEffective date 7/25/2021.
2021-04-16SenateChapter 95, 2021 Laws.
2021-04-16SenateGovernor signed.
2021-04-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-08SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-03-23HouseED - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-18HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2021-02-03SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-02-03SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-01-29SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2021-01-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-01-27SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2021-01-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM.
2021-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2021-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a320148Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5184&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Bills/5184.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Senate%20Passed%20Legislature/5184.PL.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/Session%20Laws/Senate/5184.SL.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5184%20SBA%20EDU%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5184%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5184%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5184%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5184%20HBA%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5184%20HBR%20ED%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/5184%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/5184%20SBR%20FBR%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123385&actionText=EDU%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28339&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123385&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-03-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5184&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123385&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28929&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123385&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-05-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5184&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments

feedback