WA SB5184 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Evaluating the need for a digital forensic crime lab.
Title
Evaluating the need for a digital forensic crime lab.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-08 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-08 | Chapter 27, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-08 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-02 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-01 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-01 | President signed. | |
2009-03-30 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-30 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-17 | PSEP - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | PSEP - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-04 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. | |
2009-03-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-10 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-04 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1248 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.