WA SB5183 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning career and technical education funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning career and technical education funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-16SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2017-02-14SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2017-02-14SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1282 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-21 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback